TN SB0769 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, transfers regulatory authority over municipality operating electric plant that provides cable, video programming, Internet or similar services to Tennessee Regulatory Authority for such services. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, transfers regulatory authority over municipality operating electric plant that provides cable, video programming, Internet or similar services to Tennessee Regulatory Authority for such services. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52, Part 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0990 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0769&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0769.pdf |