TN SB0777 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes filings for personal risk insurance that provide for an overall statewide rate increase or decrease of no more than 15% in the aggregate for all coverages that are subject to the filing to take effect the date it is filed. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, authorizes filings for personal risk insurance that provide for an overall statewide rate increase or decrease of no more than 15% in the aggregate for all coverages that are subject to the filing to take effect the date it is filed. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Johnson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Johnson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Pub. Ch. 94 | |
2011-04-28 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-11 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-06 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-05 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-04 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-04-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0051) | |
2011-04-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-04-04 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-03-31 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-31 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-31 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0108) | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Action def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/22/11 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0967 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 94