TN SB0783 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds Buffalo River Resort in Perry County to the definition of premier type tourist resort for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption, if local legislation body adopts resolution adopting resort as premier type tourist resort. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, adds Buffalo River Resort in Perry County to the definition of premier type tourist resort for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption, if local legislation body adopts resolution adopting resort as premier type tourist resort. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 440 | |
2011-05-19 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0478) | |
2011-05-19 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0055) | |
2011-05-19 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 | |
2011-03-03 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0592 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 440