TN SB0839 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes Washington County to establish a convenient voting center pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to convenient voting centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 397 | |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0937 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023