TN SB0842 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. H&W Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. H&W Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a county mayor to cremate or bury the body of a deceased person who has died in an institution supported in whole or part by public expense and has remained unclaimed after 96 hours notwithstanding any objection to the contrary. - Amends TCA Section 68-4-103.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a county mayor to cremate or bury the body of a deceased person who has died in an institution supported in whole or part by public expense and has remained unclaimed after 96 hours notwithstanding any objection to the contrary. - Amends TCA Section 68-4-103.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Rick Womick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. H&W Comm. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0374 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0842&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0842.pdf |