TN SB0910 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that in any criminal proceeding involving certain sex offenses committed against a victim less than 13 years of age the testimony of a forensic interviewer is admissible. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2; Title 24, Chapter 7, Part 1; Title 37, Chapter 1 and Title 40, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, specifies that in any criminal proceeding involving certain sex offenses committed against a victim less than 13 years of age the testimony of a forensic interviewer is admissible. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2; Title 24, Chapter 7, Part 1; Title 37, Chapter 1 and Title 40, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0328 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0910&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0910.pdf |