TN SB0915 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits persons engaged in the business of towing motor vehicles by wrecker or otherwise, or storing such motor vehicles, for remuneration from charging the owner or lienholder a storage fee for a period exceeding 21 days without the owner or lienholder's consent unless certain exceptions apply. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 23 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 23 and Title 66, relative to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/3/2024 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1015 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.