TN SB1114 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, declares that a moving party prevails on a motion for summary judgment if it submits affirmative evidence negating an element of a nonmoving party's claim or demonstrates that the nonmoving party's evidence is insufficient to establish an essential element. - Amends TCA Title 20.
Title
As enacted, declares that a moving party prevails on a motion for summary judgment if it submits affirmative evidence negating an element of a nonmoving party's claim or demonstrates that the nonmoving party's evidence is insufficient to establish an essential element. - Amends TCA Title 20.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498 | |
2011-05-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0580) | |
2011-05-20 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1358 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 498