TN SB1134 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds conviction of a new sexual offense, violent sexual offense, or violent juvenile sexual offense as violation of the Tennessee Sexual Offender and Violent Sexual Offender Registration, Verification and Tracking Act of 2004. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.
Title
As enacted, adds conviction of a new sexual offense, violent sexual offense, or violent juvenile sexual offense as violation of the Tennessee Sexual Offender and Violent Sexual Offender Registration, Verification and Tracking Act of 2004. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 232 | |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0838 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 232