TN SB1318 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires THEC to report on transfers by HOPE scholarship students from eligible two-year postsecondary institutions to eligible four-year postsecondary institutions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires THEC to report on transfers by HOPE scholarship students from eligible two-year postsecondary institutions to eligible four-year postsecondary institutions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1859 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-26 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1318&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1318.pdf |