TN SB1378 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from $1.00 to $5.00, the threshold before which a borrower is entitled to a refund or refund credit of the precomputed interest charge for a loan that is precomputed that the borrower prepays in full. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 12; Title 45, Chapter 18; Title 45, Chapter 5 and Title 45, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45, Chapter 12; Title 45, Chapter 18; Title 45, Chapter 5 and Title 45, Chapter 7, relative to financial transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1050 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee