TN SB1499 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement for a person to post a bond when filing a claim to seized property. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 33, relative to forfeiture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1006 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee