TN SB1575 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes a person ineligible for a political subdivision's former retirement plan in the TCRS if the person is hired after the political subdivision changes to any other plan offered by the retirement system; requires that any person wishing to establish service credit in the retirement system must establish such service under the terms of the retirement system plan that existed at the time the service was established and not at the time the service was rendered. - Amends TCA Section 8-35-253 and Section 8-37-214.
Title
As enacted, makes a person ineligible for a political subdivision's former retirement plan in the TCRS if the person is hired after the political subdivision changes to any other plan offered by the retirement system; requires that any person wishing to establish service credit in the retirement system must establish such service under the terms of the retirement system plan that existed at the time the service was established and not at the time the service was rendered. - Amends TCA Section 8-35-253 and Section 8-37-214.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 686 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/11/2020 | |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-06-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1641 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 686