TN SB1586 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/12/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/12/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the district attorneys general conference, the administrative office of the courts, the Tennessee chapter of children's advocacy centers, the department of children's services, and law enforcement agencies to enter into data sharing agreements that allow for the sharing of information necessary to ensure compliance with statutory reporting requirements; specifies that data shared pursuant to an agreement retains its confidential status consistent with current law. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2 and Title 37, relative to data sharing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Effective date(s) 03/12/2024 | |
2024-03-19 | Pub. Ch. 559 | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2788 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 559