TN SB1609 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of correction to June 30, 2027; requires the department to report back to the government operations committee by December 31, 2024, to update the committee on its progress in addressing the findings set forth in the December 2023 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3, relative to the department of correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2024 | |
2024-04-03 | Pub. Ch. 593 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 11, PNV 0 |
2024-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1752 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 593