TN SB1745 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts judges and chancellors who are prohibited from practicing law from the professional privilege tax assessed to persons licensed as attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As introduced, exempts judges and chancellors who are prohibited from practicing law from the professional privilege tax assessed to persons licensed as attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1551 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020