TN SB1769 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the definition of "adjudication as a mental defective" to include a person who has been found incompetent to stand trial in a criminal proceeding and requires the clerk of court in such a proceeding to collect and report any such finding to the federal bureau of investigation-NICS Index and the department of safety; establishes a rebuttable presumption that a person who has been charged with a criminal offense and found incompetent to stand trial poses a substantial likelihood of serious harm; prohibits the purchase or possession of a firearm by a person who has been adjudicated as a mental defective. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to mental health.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1640 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.