TN SB1785 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the evidence requirement from a preponderance of the evidence to clear and convincing evidence for rebutting the presumption that drugs or alcohol were the proximate cause of an injury from a drug test result or the refusal to submit to a drug test. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 50, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, changes the evidence requirement from a preponderance of the evidence to clear and convincing evidence for rebutting the presumption that drugs or alcohol were the proximate cause of an injury from a drug test result or the refusal to submit to a drug test. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 50, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 203 | |
2011-05-25 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-10 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-05 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-05 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-04-25 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-04-21 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/21/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2047 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 203