TN SB1798 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies definition of utility district commissioner for purposes of continuing education requirements; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 7-82-308; Section 7-82-709; Section 68-221-1305; Section 68-221-605; Section 68-221-1009 and Section 68-221-1206.
Title
As enacted, clarifies definition of utility district commissioner for purposes of continuing education requirements; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 7-82-308; Section 7-82-709; Section 68-221-1305; Section 68-221-605; Section 68-221-1009 and Section 68-221-1206.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 627 | |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1630 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 627