TN SB1798 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an applicant for a server permit to have successfully completed a program of alcohol awareness training, for persons involved in the direct service of alcohol, wine, or beer by an entity certified by the commission to have an adequate training curriculum for alcohol awareness, within one year prior to the submission of the application; requires the curriculum to include training on the role of alcohol in sexual assault and harassment and on recognizing and reporting signs of human trafficking; authorizes certain reciprocity with similar programs in other states. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to training for persons selling intoxicating liquors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2025 | |
2024-04-29 | Pub. Ch. 731 | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0835) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 4, PNV 0 |
2024-04-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0835) |
2024-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1870 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 731