TN SB1931 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local governments to report, no later than February 1, 2021, to the general assembly the number of business licenses issued to places of accommodation for transients for calendar year 2020. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires local governments to report, no later than February 1, 2021, to the general assembly the number of business licenses issued to places of accommodation for transients for calendar year 2020. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1881 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.