TN SB1938 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, names the law prohibiting an LEA from deducting dues from the wages of the LEA's employees for a professional employees' organization the "Michael Maren Paycheck Protection Act." - Amends TCA Section 49-2-123.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-2-123, relative to naming the law prohibiting an LEA from deducting dues from the wages of the LEA's employees for a professional employees' organization the "Michael Maren Paycheck Protection Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 12, PNV 6 |
2024-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. |
2024-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to lift from the table adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2155 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Sponsor(s) Added.