TN SB1988 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 15 days to 10 calendar days, the time period in which a licensee for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption must submit payment for any prior tax, interest, or penalty levied following the sale or closure of the business. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 49; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, reduces, from 15 days to 10 calendar days, the time period in which a licensee for the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption must submit payment for any prior tax, interest, or penalty levied following the sale or closure of the business. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 49; Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1879 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn.