TN SB2043 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to publish the guidelines for the best practices for identifying and reporting signs of child abuse, child sexual abuse, and human trafficking in which the victim is a child on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to publish the guidelines for the best practices for identifying and reporting signs of child abuse, child sexual abuse, and human trafficking in which the victim is a child on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2093 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration