TN SB2174 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the provisions governing the department's mandatory child care agency report card system and its separate and voluntary child care agency rated licensing system and implements a quality assessment and rating system for the purpose of evaluating licensed and approved child care agencies. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, revises the provisions governing the department's mandatory child care agency report card system and its separate and voluntary child care agency rated licensing system and implements a quality assessment and rating system for the purpose of evaluating licensed and approved child care agencies. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2243 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee