TN SB2240 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the bureau to establish a temporary TennCare benefits program to provide medical assistance on a temporary basis to certain individuals who do not qualify for enrollment in TennCare, CoverKids, or a successor program; requires the bureau to submit a waiver to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services by December 31, 2024. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2631 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee