TN SB2260 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, gives the state board of education administrative subpoena power in connection with investigations related to licensure disciplinary actions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, gives the state board of education administrative subpoena power in connection with investigations related to licensure disciplinary actions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 733 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1976 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733