TN SB2274 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a pharmacy or other authorized dispensing person or entity to make all reasonable efforts to contact and notify a person of the lowest available cost of a prescription drug prior to the point of sale. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71, relative to prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0777) |
2024-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0703) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2897 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.