TN SB2357 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the confirmation process for appointments to the Tennessee heritage conservation trust fund board of trustees, the state board of education, the standards recommendation committee, the board of regents, and the local governing board of trustees for each of the six state universities. - Amends TCA Title 11 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, revises the confirmation process for appointments to the Tennessee heritage conservation trust fund board of trustees, the state board of education, the standards recommendation committee, the board of regents, and the local governing board of trustees for each of the six state universities. - Amends TCA Title 11 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2284 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee