TN SB2411 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes mandatory sentence of community supervision for 90 days if a person commits certain offenses under the supervision and control of the department. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to community supervision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2518 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee