TN SB2514 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds the short title "The Gabby Act" to Chapter 237 of the Public Acts of 2023, which requires district attorneys general to designate one assistant district attorney general as the lead prosecutor in cases involving crimes committed against children and requires the Tennessee bureau of investigation to provide annual training to assistant district attorneys designated as lead prosecutors in crimes committed against children. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 38 and Chapter 237 of the Public Acts of 2023.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 38 and Chapter 237 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to crimes against children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Effective date(s) 04/04/2024 | |
2024-04-08 | Pub. Ch. 649 | |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2643 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649