TN SB2539 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reconstitutes the state energy policy council by adding a representative of the Oak Ridge National Laboratory and a representative of the nuclear energy industry. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 59; Title 60; Title 65 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 59; Title 60; Title 65 and Title 68, relative to energy policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Re-refer to S. Cal Comm |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2118 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Signed by H. Speaker