TN SB2559 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the import and export of human remains by state, local, and municipal law enforcement agencies for the purpose of human remains detection training; requires the Tennessee bureau of investigation, in consultation with the department of health, to promulgate rules regarding the secure storage of human remains, the use of human remains as a training aid for human remains detection training, and proper disposal methods for human remains, after such remains can no longer be used as a training aid. - Amends TCA Title 11; Title 38 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 11; Title 38 and Title 68, relative to the handling of human remains for law enforcement training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1 (Amendment 1 - HA1020) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/25/2024 |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1020) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2206 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.