TN SB2578 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 812
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 812
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the creation of a pilot program by the Cumberland regional business and agribusiness marketing authority to establish and maintain small business incubators in the region. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the creation of a pilot program by the Cumberland regional business and agribusiness marketing authority to establish and maintain small business incubators in the region. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 812 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2489 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 812