TN SB2582 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the instruction required as part of a family life curriculum; requires the Tennessee joint task force on children's justice and child sexual abuse, in consultation with the children's services advisory council, to annually recommend certain age-appropriate curricula to the department of education; revises the information that LEAs and public charter schools must annually provide to the department of children's services. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 49, relative to child abuse prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 571 | |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2687 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 571