TN HB2687 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the instruction required as part of a family life curriculum; requires the Tennessee joint task force on children's justice and child sexual abuse, in consultation with the children's services advisory council, to annually recommend certain age-appropriate curricula to the department of education; revises the information that LEAs and public charter schools must annually provide to the department of children's services. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 49, relative to child abuse prevention.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] |
Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 571 | |
2024-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-02-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2024-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2582 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024