TN SB2586 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a third-party voter registration organization to register and provide certain information to the coordinator of elections before engaging in a voter registration event or program; prohibits persons and organizations collecting voter registrations from taking certain actions with regard to the voter registrations and provides civil penalties for violations. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY RUDD AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY RUDD AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 4 (Amendment 2 - HA0949) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 4 (Amendment 1 - HA0909) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0949) |
2024-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0909) |
2024-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0902) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1955 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.