TN SB2644 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the requirement that the board of a water and wastewater treatment authority that does not provide water service include a person in the field of law. - Amends TCA Section 68-221-605.
Title
As enacted, removes the requirement that the board of a water and wastewater treatment authority that does not provide water service include a person in the field of law. - Amends TCA Section 68-221-605.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696 | |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 3/22/18 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2035 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 696