TN SB2644 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits political campaign committees from using campaign funds for any other purpose other than a contribution or expenditure; prohibits the disbursement of campaign funds of a political campaign committee for a candidate's or a multicandidate political campaign committee officer's own personal use. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10; Title 3 and Title 4, Chapter 55.
Title
As introduced, prohibits political campaign committees from using campaign funds for any other purpose other than a contribution or expenditure; prohibits the disbursement of campaign funds of a political campaign committee for a candidate's or a multicandidate political campaign committee officer's own personal use. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10; Title 3 and Title 4, Chapter 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2431 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee