TN SB2659 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands student eligibility for a Tennessee future teacher scholarship to include students enrolled in an approved educator preparation program at Western Governors University. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 7, relative to scholarships for aspiring teachers.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2180 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Signed by H. Speaker