TN SB2737 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-26 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-26 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an October 1, 2014, statute of repose for personal injury and death actions that accrued prior to the effective date of the Tennessee Civil Justice Act of 2011. - Amends TCA Title 28.
Title
As introduced, creates an October 1, 2014, statute of repose for personal injury and death actions that accrued prior to the effective date of the Tennessee Civil Justice Act of 2011. - Amends TCA Title 28.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3121 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2737&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2737.pdf |