TN SB2756 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, requires the board of mayor and aldermen to hold regular public meetings as specified by ordinance rather than on the first Monday night of each month. - Amends Chapter 606 of the Private Acts of 1951; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, requires the board of mayor and aldermen to hold regular public meetings as specified by ordinance rather than on the first Monday night of each month. - Amends Chapter 606 of the Private Acts of 1951; as amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 62 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2724 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pr. Ch. 62