TN SB2767 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to annually transmit, no later than October 1 of each year, filings submitted to the commissioner by a local board of education regarding any action or inaction taken by the board in response to an investigation conducted by the director of schools in response to a complaint filed by a parent or legal guardian of a student who received instruction in family life that the parent or legal guardian believes to violate the requirements for such instruction to the chairs of the education committees of the senate and house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2435 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.