TN SB2772 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the road supervisor rather than the county mayor to sign checks drawn on the county trustee for expenses associated with road work within the county. - Amends Chapter 511 of the Private Acts of 1945, as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 511 of the Private Acts of 1945; as amended by Chapter 107 of the Private Acts of 1951; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the DeKalb County road supervisor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36 | |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1621 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Pr. Ch. 36