TN SB2838 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Ballot Access Act." - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2800 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2838&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SB2838.pdf |