TN SB2869 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from October 1 to October 15 the date by which the chief procurement officer must annually report to the speaker of the senate, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the governor on the status of the federal Comprehensive Iran Sanctions, Accountability, and Divestment Act of 2010, the Iran Divestment Act of 2014, and any rules or regulations adopted thereunder. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 12; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 50, relative to the security of Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1996 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.