TN SB2908 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a funeral director or funeral establishment providing funeral services for a deceased person insured or believed to be insured under a contract of life insurance to request certain information about the life insurance contract. - Amends TCA Title 35; Title 56 and Title 62, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 35; Title 56 and Title 62, Chapter 5, relative to life insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2148 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee