TN SB2923 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, revises charter provisions relating to contracts procured by the City; authorizes city council to fix the time and place of regular meetings of the council; requires a two-thirds vote of the city council to adopt an ordinance or resolution where specified; clarifies that certain ordinances may require a minimum time between two readings prior to becoming effective. - Amends Chapter 568 of the Private Acts of 1939; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, revises charter provisions relating to contracts procured by the City; authorizes city council to fix the time and place of regular meetings of the council; requires a two-thirds vote of the city council to adopt an ordinance or resolution where specified; clarifies that certain ordinances may require a minimum time between two readings prior to becoming effective. - Amends Chapter 568 of the Private Acts of 1939; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 50 | |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2916 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pr. Ch. 50