TN SB2933 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the state, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell its interest-bearing bonds and bond anticipation notes for certain purposes. - Amends certain public acts authorizing the issuance of general obligation bonds and bond anticipation notes. This act makes appropriations for an indefinite period of time for the purpose of allocating the proceeds of the bonds and notes authorized by this act.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the state, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell its interest-bearing bonds and bond anticipation notes for certain purposes. - Amends certain public acts authorizing the issuance of general obligation bonds and bond anticipation notes. This act makes appropriations for an indefinite period of time for the purpose of allocating the proceeds of the bonds and notes authorized by this act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. Cal 6-10-20 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Appropriations Subcommittee calendar for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate FW&M Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Delayed Bills Committee |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2923 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee