TN HB2923 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the state, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell its interest-bearing bonds and bond anticipation notes for certain purposes. - Amends certain public acts authorizing the issuance of general obligation bonds and bond anticipation notes. This act makes appropriations for an indefinite period of time for the purpose of allocating the proceeds of the bonds and notes authorized by this act.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the state, acting by resolution of its funding board, to issue and sell its interest-bearing bonds and bond anticipation notes for certain purposes. - Amends certain public acts authorizing the issuance of general obligation bonds and bond anticipation notes. This act makes appropriations for an indefinite period of time for the purpose of allocating the proceeds of the bonds and notes authorized by this act.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-06-01 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2020-05-29 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 6/1/2020 |
2020-05-19 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2020-05-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2933 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee